This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/16/2023 at 01:09:04 (UTC).

Martha Aldaco et al. v. York Enterprises South Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2023 Martha Aldaco filed an Other lawsuit against York Enterprises South Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Frangie, Janet. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0850

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Frangie, Janet

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Martha Aldaco

Nayeli Hernandez

Respondents and Defendants

York Enterprises South Inc.

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Joseph V. Bui

Amy-Lyn Morse

Cynthia Elaine Tobisman

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Perrochet

John Barrow Sprangers

Shane Heather McKenzie

Craig Allen Taggart

Michael Donn Mortenson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's appendix filed. Due on 09/25/2023 By 61 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (28 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order on motion filed.; Notes: Respondent's motion filed May 26, 2023 to stay appeal until Supreme Court renders a decision in a pending case is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Respondents' Motion to Stay Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: By respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for stay filed.; Notes: By respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondents; Mortenson Taggart Adams LLP is associated w/Horvitz & Levy LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellants; Knight Law Group, LLP with Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: emailed to counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Mar 8, 2023; Martha Aldaco & Nayeli Hernandez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVDS2011352; Trial Court Judge: Frangie, Janet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less