This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/06/2023 at 00:46:51 (UTC).

Maritza Zavala v. Hyundai Motor America

Case Summary

On 03/07/2023 Maritza Zavala filed an Other lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hopp, Harold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0847

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hopp, Harold

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Maritza Zavala

Defendant and Appellant

Hyundai Motor America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond P. Boucher

Joseph V. Bui

Daniel Max Kalinowski

Cynthia Elaine Tobisman

Roger R. Kirnos

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Robert L Wise

Brian Takahashi

Richard L. Stuhlbarg

Carissa A. Casolari

Jennifer T. Persky

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 10/06/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: The court grants the application of appellant filed Jun 9, 2023, to permit Robert L. Wise to appear in this case as counsel pro hac vice in association with Jennifer T. Persky of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP and Brian Takahashi of Bowman and Brooke LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Settlement not pos., appellant noticed to file AOB.; Notes: The stay of the appeal filed 05/10/23 is DISSOLVED, and all proceedings in the appeal are ORDERED to RECOMMENCE. The record on appeal has been filed. Appellant is to file AOB and appendix within 40 days of the date of this order (parties noticed RE: exhibits).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference held.; Notes: Settlement not possible.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Settlement Conference Scheduled for:; Notes: @ 10:00 a.m. (REMOTE S/C). Parties noticed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Respondent's counsel RE: need his client's e-mail address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Respondent's counsel RE: need his client's e-mail address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: NOTICE RE: instructions for attending 06/26/23 REMOTE S/C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd May 2, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Apr 3, 2023 *8.124 w/reporter's transcript*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP for appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Mar 7, 2023; Hyundai Motor America

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: PSC1807879; Trial Court Judge: Hopp, Harold

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less