This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/09/2022 at 18:46:53 (UTC).

Margaret Williams LLC v. Long Beach Unified School District et al.

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 Margaret Williams LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Long Beach Unified School District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0078

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kim, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant

Margaret Williams LLC

Defendants, Respondents and Not Yet Classified

Howard Contracting, Inc.

Linik Corporation

Long Beach Unified School District

Pinner Construction Co., Inc.

Respondent, Defendant and Not Yet Classified

Long Beach Unified School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Wilmer J. Harris

Attorney at Schonbrun Seplow Harris and Hoffman LLP

715 Fremont Avenue Suite A

Pasadena, CA 91030

Sami Nabil Khadder

Attorney at KHADDER LAW FIRM

1700 S. Amphlett Blvd. Ste. 250G

San Mateo, CA 94402

Defendant, Respondent and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Hans Christian Ruschke

Attorney at Bullard, Brown & Beal LLP

234 E Commonwealth Ave 2Nd Fl

Fullerton, CA 92832-1911

Carl J. Kanowsky

Attorney at Kanowsky & Associates

26481 Summit Circle

Santa Clarita, CA 91350

Michael Edgar Gallagher, Jr

Attorney at Bassi Edlin Huie & Blum LLP

515 S Flower St Ste 1020

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Martin Anthony Hom

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud & Romo

12800 Center Court Drive, Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed as abandoned; Disposition Type: Final Appellant Margaret Williams LLC filed a notice of settlement on September 14, 2021. Appellant has not filed a request for dismissal of appeal or notice of abandonment within the time required pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.244(a)(3). It is hereby ordered that the appeal filed December 24, 2020 is dismissed as abandoned. Each side shall bear its own costs on appeal. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(a)(4).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.; Notes: Appellant Margaret Williams LLC filed a notice of settlement on September 14, 2021. Appellant has not filed a request for dismissal of appeal or notice of abandonment within the time required pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.244(a)(3). It is hereby ordered that the appeal filed December 24, 2020 is dismissed as abandoned. Each side shall bear its own costs on appeal. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(a)(4).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3 (788 Pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 11, 2021: 8.122 w. RT to be LODGED - (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Margaret Williams LLC Attorney: Wilmer J. Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Margaret Williams LLCAttorney: Wilmer J. Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant is in default for failure to file a complete Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g), for the appeal filed December 24, 2020. So that the Court can establish jurisdiction and appealability, the Court requires appellant to provide a fully completed statement with appropriate documents. The enclosed form is being returned because it is lacking signed order or judgment. A NEW PROOF OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED ON OPPOSING PARTY TO INCLUDE A COPY OF THE COMPLETE CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT. (CRC rules 8.100(g)(2) & 8.25(a)(1) & (2)). If a Case Information Statement is not filed within 15 days from the date of this notice, or it is not completely filled out or it is lacking the attachments as required, the court may impose sanctions, including dismissal on the grounds of non-compliance with rule 8.100(g), and failure to establish that this court has jurisdiction over the case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: No signed order or judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Margaret Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: no fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 12/24/2020 by Margaret Williams LLC ("U")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: NC060708; Trial Court Judge: Kim, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Howard Contracting Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Margaret Williams, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant