This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2022 at 21:40:38 (UTC).

Marafie v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Marafie filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Meiers, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5719

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Meiers, Barbara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mishari Marafie

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Barbara Ann Meiers

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Century City Mall, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Kelsey Lynn Solberg

Attorney at Mashian Law Group, APC

1777 San Vicente Blvd Suite 640

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Bryan Mashian

Attorney at Mashian Law Group, APC

11777 San Vicente Blvd Suite 640

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Walter Whitman Moore

Attorney at Mashian Law Group, APC

11777 San Vicente Blvd Suite 640

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Brian D. Huben

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2909

Tanya Marie Taylor

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Omarr K. Rambert

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on October 15, 2021 and the amended exhibits filed on October 18, 2021. Petitioner does not establish that the respondent court erred or otherwise demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. Accordingly, the petition is denied. Grimes, Acting P.J. / Stratton, J. / Wiley, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume one of exhibits with corrected and consecutive pagination.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY CITY MALL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR TANYA M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUBEN BRIAN