This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/06/2023 at 10:02:16 (UTC).

Map Group, LLC et al. v. Howard

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Map Group, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Howard. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kin, Curtis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5150

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kin, Curtis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Appellants

Map Group, LLC

Digital Ignition Entertainment, LLC

Map Production Services, LLC

RJ Mitte

Respondents and Not Yet Classified

Terrance Howard

Mira Howard

Universal Bridges, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Fahim Farivar

Respondent and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Elana Rebecca Levine

Michael Jeffrey Saltz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/20/2023

DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to appellant's request to dismiss appeal filed July 17, 2023, the appeal filed November 21, 2022, is dismissed. The remittitur shall issue forthwith (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 8.244(c)(2).)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for dismissal of appeal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: NINE: Clerks (2627 Pages)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The time within which to pay clerk's transcript fees is extended to 05/26/2023. Final Extension.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: Extension request to pay clerk's transcript fees in SCLA (to 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The time within which to pay clerk's transcript fees is extended to 4/28/2023. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: extension request to pay clerk's fees in SCLA (to 4/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 7, 2022: 8.122 no RT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Map Group, LLC Attorney: Fahim Farivar Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Digital Ignition Entertainment, LLC Attorney: Fahim Farivar Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Map Production Services, LLC Attorney: Fahim Farivar Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: RJ Mitte Attorney: Fahim Farivar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Map Group, LLCAttorney: Fahim Farivar Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Digital Ignition Entertainment, LLCAttorney: Fahim Farivar Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Map Production Services, LLCAttorney: Fahim Farivar Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: RJ MitteAttorney: Fahim Farivar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: R343648 Civil Filing Fee paid $775.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on November 21, 2022 by Map Group, LLC, Digital Ignition Entertainment, LLC, Map Production Services, LLC and RJ Mitte.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV37225; Trial Court Judge: Kin, Curtis

[+] Read More [-] Read Less