This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/26/2023 at 05:03:21 (UTC).

MANLIN v. MILNER

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 MANLIN filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against MILNER. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6919

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Roger Manlin

Respondents and Defendants

Steve Milner

Ann S. Lee

Gregg A. Martin

Hamburg, Karic, Edwards & Martin LLP

1220 Nadeau St., LLC

1562 Seabright Avenue, LLC

157 East Panama Road, LLC

6363 Lindbergh, LLC

120 E. Church Ave., LLC

1615 N. Downs, LLC

921 W. Inyokern Road, LLC

103 B Street, LLC

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Scott Klapach

Ann S. Lee

Gregg Adam Martin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed; Notes: Due to clerical error, the order filed on December 7, 2022, extending the time for granting or denying review, is amended to reflect the title above.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including January 13, 2023, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed; Notes: Joseph S. Klapach for respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Steve Milner Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: Ann S. Lee Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: Gregg A. Martin Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: Hamburg, Karic, Edwards & Martin LLP Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: 1220 Nadeau St., LLC Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: 1562 Seabright Avenue, LLC Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: 157 East Panama Road, LLC Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: 6363 Lindbergh, LLC Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: 120 E. Church Ave., LLC Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: 1615 N. Downs, LLC Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: 921 W. Inyokern Road, LLC Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach Defendant and Respondent: 103 B Street, LLC Attorney: Joseph Scott Klapach *B313253 & B315077 consolidated by Court of Appeal**Court of Appeal order granting publication filed September 7, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B315077 B313253 (lead); Disposition: Affirmed/part, rev/part, remanded w/direction; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV08154

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less