This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/24/2022 at 00:08:36 (UTC).

Mandir, a California Non-Profit Corporation v. Tiwari et al.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Mandir, a California Non-Profit Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Tiwari. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Servino, Deborah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0437

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Servino, Deborah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Mandir, a California Non-Profit Corporation

Respondents and Defendants

Vishwanath Tiwari

Newport Beach, CA 92658

Shashi Tiwari

Newport Beach, CA 92658-9623

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Minh Hieu Thi Luong

Attorney at Chugh LLP

15925 Carmenita Rd

Cerritos, CA 90703-2206

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Robert Finlay

4665 Macarthur Ct #200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Timothy Michael Kowal

Attorney at Thomas Vogele & Associates, APC

129 W Wilson St, Ste 200

Costa Mesa, CA 92627

Charles Christophe McKenna

4665 Macarthur Court Ste 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Fee paidLAST EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 08/23/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Timothy Kowal SUBS IN for Vishwanath Tiwari responent pro per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Timothy Kowal SUBS IN for Shashi Tiwari responent pro per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: STIP to extend the due date for RB, per rule 8.212(b)(1) parties can only stipulate up to 60 days. 60 days have been previously stipulated to.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/24/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 05/25/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed.; Notes: by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default appellant; no certificate of interested persons filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: Clerk's transcript filed. Due on 09/27/2021 By 0 Day Reporter Donna Boulger's ext request is granted to 09/25/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension requested.; Notes: filed by Donna Boulger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: D. Boulger; M. Lott-Meyerhofer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 7/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 7/9/21 - proceeding with CTs and RTs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: aplt. Mandir, a California Non-Profit Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01028690; Trial Court Judge: Servino, Deborah

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mandir, a California Non-Profit Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Michael Kowal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer T Robert Finlay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKENNA CHARLES CHRISTOPHER