This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/05/2023 at 06:09:03 (UTC).

Maldonado et al. v. Aluminum Precision Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Maldonado filed an Other lawsuit against Aluminum Precision Products, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wilson, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1415

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wilson, Peter

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

John Maldonado, Jr.

Gregory Maratas

Bernardo Sandoval

Hoang Thi Nguyen

Respondent and Defendant

Aluminum Precision Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Sima Farde

23 Corporate Plaza Ste 150

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Ronda Diane Jamgotchian

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

1901 Ave Of The Stars 16Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Paul Berkowitz

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

1901 Ave Of The Stars Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6055

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: John Maldonado, Jr. Attorney: Sima Farde Plaintiff and Appellant: Gregory Maratas Attorney: Sima Farde Plaintiff and Appellant: Bernardo Sandoval Attorney: Sima Farde Plaintiff and Appellant: Hoang Thi Nguyen Attorney: Sima Farde One extension granted for a total of 28 days: 11/29/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed:. Due on 01/09/2023 By 28 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: John Maldonado, Jr.Attorney: Sima Farde Plaintiff and Appellant: Gregory MaratasAttorney: Sima Farde Plaintiff and Appellant: Bernardo SandovalAttorney: Sima Farde Plaintiff and Appellant: Hoang Thi NguyenAttorney: Sima Farde; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 28 days: 11/29/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed:. Due on 01/09/2023 By 28 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty Sima Farde will argue for appellants - 30 minutes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's request for ARB EOT to 1-7-23. Returned. 1) Question #2, states brief due 12-7-22. Brief is actually due 12-12-22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Respondent's fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: Respondents notice of errata correcting cover page for Respondent's Brief filed 11-22-22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-1 (52 pages).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellants' filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: L. Anastasiou, J. Hong.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS statement. Rejected. 1) In Part I - Question 1-b - item not checked. 2) In Part III - cannot have et al. for parties. Must list every party to the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS - must provide all parties involved on part III of the document.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplts: John Maldonado, Jr. et al. Proceeding by 8.124 and RT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2020-01164707; Trial Court Judge: Wilson, Peter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less