This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/25/2023 at 19:02:20 (UTC).

Malaga County Water District v. Central Valley Regional Water Quality Control Board et al.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 Malaga County Water District filed an Other lawsuit against Central Valley Regional Water Quality Control Board. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jurkovich, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4875

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Jurkovich, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Malaga County Water District

State Water Resources Control Board

Central Valley Regional Water Quality Control Board

Appellants and Defendants

State Water Resources Control Board

Central Valley Regional Water Quality Control Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Neal Costanzo

Attorney at Costanzo & Associates

575 E. Locust Ave. Suite 115

Fresno, CA 93720

Adam Leonard Levitan

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Michael Phillip Cayaban

Attorney at CA Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Adam Leonard Levitan

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Michael Phillip Cayaban

Attorney at CA Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/04/2023 By 45 Day(s) 1st stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: opening brief and appendix due in 40 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: 1 Master; R4, 82 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: admin record filed 9/29/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record returned to county for corrections.; Notes: The title on the cover page for the Master Index, Volume 1 and 4 by court reporter Teresa Macial needs to be corrected. Please send the corrected cover pages to this court within 8 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Sent to ctrrs Maciel, Silva and Watson on 12/2/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 11/10/22 for 2nd appeal submitted by AG Levitan; appendix with rtx

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: to respondent(2nd appeal) on 10/25/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Briefing sequence order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to California Rules of Court and based on the joint stipulation of the parties, the following briefing schedule is ordered: 1. The opening brief of Malaga County Water District (Malaga) is due 40 days after the record on appeal has been filed. 2. A combined respondents' brief and appellants' opening brief on cross-appeal by respondents Central Valley Regional Water Quality Control Board and State Water Resources Control Board (Board) is due 30 days after the opening brief by Malaga is filed. 3. A combined respondent's brief and appellant's reply brief by Malaga is due 30 days after Board files the respondents'/cross-appellants' brief. 4. A reply brief, if any, by Board is due 20 days after the brief in No. 3 is filed. The above briefing schedule does not restrict any party's ability to stipulate or apply for an extension of time as allowed by California Rules of Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 10/06/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: AG Levitan obo respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: atty Costanzo obo applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: (Corrected) the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Atty Costanzo obo Applt Malaga County Water District and request for admin record (included in Notice of Appeal) filed 8/26/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: Repondents State Water Resources Control Board and Central Valley Regional Water Quality Control Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: for applt Malaga Co Water District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: atty Costanzo obo applt appeals from judgment on writ of administrative mandamus on 6/24/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Madera County Superior Court - Main; County: Madera; Trial Court Case Number: MCV071280; Trial Court Judge: Jurkovich, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less