This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/09/2022 at 02:27:51 (UTC).

Magnuson v. Pacifica Real Estate Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Magnuson filed an Other lawsuit against Pacifica Real Estate Services, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6410

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Barry Magnuson

Respondent and Defendant

Pacifica Real Estate Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Minh Tri Nguyen

Attorney at Nguyen Lawyers, ALC

3777 Long Beach Blvd. 3Rd Floor

Long Beach, CA 90807

Christine Jungco Gonong

Attorney at Nguyen Lawyers, ALC

3777 Long Beach Boulevard Third Floor

Long Beach, CA 90807

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Thomas E. Beach

Attorney at Beach Law Group, LLP

500 E. Esplanade Drive, Suite 1400

Oxnard, CA 93036

Darryl Craig Hottinger

Attorney at Beach Law Group, LLP

500 E. Esplanade Dr., Suite 1400

Oxnard, CA 93036

Vivian Francisca Yochelson

Attorney at Yochelson & Associates

5350 Topanga Canyon Blvd

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: notice of designation filed 11/10/2021 SCLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Christine J. Gonong's letter dated December 16, 2021 submitted on December 16, 2021 via truefiling has been rejected. Our records indicated that there are no pending actions in this appeal. This appeal was abandoned on December 2, 2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final Abandonment filed on 12/2/2021 in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: Abandonment filed in trial court on 12/2/2021. Notice filed 12/10/2021 to attorney re Abandonment of Appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (November 3, 2021 by Barry Magnuson ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #0762 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 10, 2021: 8.122 no RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 3, 2021 by Barry Magnuson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 18STCV05908

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFICA REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOCHELSON VIVIAN FRANCISCA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOTTINGER DARRYL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEACH THOMAS E.