This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/09/2022 at 20:38:26 (UTC).

Magallanes v. The Superior Court of Tulare County

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Magallanes filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Tulare County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3348

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Juan Magallnes

Juan Magallanes

Respondent

The Superior Court of Tulare County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jeremy Eric Fredericksen

Attorney at Tulare County Public Defender

20 N. Main Street

Porterville, CA 93257

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244

Katherine Nicole Smith

Attorney at Tulare County District attorney

221 S Mooney Blvd Rm 224

Visalia, CA 93291-4547

Andrew W. Kosch

Attorney at Tulare Co District Attorney

15 E Olive Ave

Porterville, CA 93257

Office Of The District Attorney

224 S. Mooney Blvd., Room 224

Visalia, CA 93291

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: Supreme Court Simone- re typo in petitioner's last name in the denial order issued 12/16/21. corrected party/title screen and docket to show correct spelling as "Magallanes"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: public defender re -paper copy of document recvd. but the court does not accept paper copies from counsel. we already recvd the Electronic copy via True Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed in Supreme Court.; Notes: per e-mail from Supreme Court; S272393

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT:* The "Petition for Writ of Prohibition &," filed on September 27, 2021, is denied. Poochigian, A.P.J. * Before Poochigian, A.P.J., Smith, J. and DeSantos, Jnote: correct spelling of petitioners last name is: Magallanes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: petitioner's informal reply that did not list ADA Katherine Smith on proof of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's Reply to People's Informal respone (with pos on ADA Kate Smith)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: Request to augment the record with Transcript of Body Cam Footage by Pub Defender Jeremy Fredericksen for Petnr Juan Magallanes

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: This court is in receipt of Real Party in Interest's informal response, filed on November 3, 2021. Petitioner is granted 20 days' leave from the date of this order to file an informal reply. Hill, P. J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest: The People Attorney: Katherine Nicole Smith by D/A Katherine Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: The PeopleAttorney: Katherine Nicole Smith; Notes: by D/A Katherine Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: amended order - the Informal response is due 30 days from the date of this order. (deadline to file changed from 10 days to 30 days)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: D.A. Andrew Kosch obtained his email address and sent petition and order issued yesterday advised him Informal Response due 10/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: copy of petiton E-Noticed to Tulare Co. D.A. email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: This court is in receipt of petitioner's "Petition for Writ of Prohibition and/or Mandate and Request for Stay of Proceedings," filed on September 27, 2021. Real party in interest (Tulare County District Attorney's Office) is directed to file an informal response to said petition on or before 10 days from the date of this order. The Clerk/Executive Officer of this court is directed to send a copy of the above entitled petition to the Tulare County District Attorney's Office along with this order. Hill, P. J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: writ info sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with request for stay of proceedings. by pub def. Jeremy Fredericksen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Tulare County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Nicole Smith