This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/09/2023 at 08:02:30 (UTC).

Madison et al. v. Spielfogel

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Madison filed an Other lawsuit against Spielfogel. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Byrdsong, Rupert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4272

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Byrdsong, Rupert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Kyle Madison

Marjan Madison

Respondent and Defendant

Daniel J. Spielfogel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Lyle R. Mink

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Mark Schaeffer

Jonathan B. Cole

Marshall R. Cole

Daniel L. Reback

 

Court Documents

B314272

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for rehearing denied.; Notes: Appellants' petition for rehearing is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: Appellants' petition for rehearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Baker, Lamar W.; Participants: Kim, Dorothy C. (Concur) Moor, Carl H. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished)The judgment is affirmed. Spielfogel shall recover his costs on appeal. Baker-Moor-Kim / 8 pages.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: This case is ordered on calendar for September 7, 2022, at 09:00 AM. All parties have elected remote appearance. The live video feed will be available on the Second District Court of Appeal's calendar page on the court's website: https://www.courts.ca.gov/11603.htm. BlueJeans login information will be provided to arguing parties only via email on Thursday, September 1, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Daniel L. Reback, for Respondent (15 minutes, remote)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Lyle R. Mink for Appellants (15 minutes, remote)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kyle MadisonAttorney: Lyle R. Mink Plaintiff and Appellant: Marjan MadisonAttorney: Lyle R. Mink; Notes: [ TWO VOLUMES OF APPELLANT'S APPENDIX ]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 19, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Mark Schaeffer of Nemecek & Cole request to be added to case as handling attorney for respondent Daniel Spielfogel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kyle Madison Attorney: Lyle R. Mink Plaintiff and Appellant: Marjan Madison Attorney: Lyle R. Mink

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kyle MadisonAttorney: Lyle R. Mink Plaintiff and Appellant: Marjan MadisonAttorney: Lyle R. Mink

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 28, 2021 by Kyle Madison et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC626872; Trial Court Judge: Byrdsong, Rupert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less