Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/15/2021 at 14:19:33 (UTC).

MacPherson et al. v. Nielsen et al.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 MacPherson filed an Other lawsuit against Nielsen. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hunt, Derek. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9758

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hunt, Derek

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Carol MacPherson

Mercer MacPherson

Defendants and Respondents

Lawrence E. Nielsen

Margaret Nielsen

Not Yet Classified

Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring St., Room 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

David R Flyer

Attorney at Flyer and Flyer

4120 Birch St Ste 101

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Robert Thomas Mackey

Attorney at Veatch Carlson

1055 Wilshire Blvd Fl 11

Los Angeles, CA 90017-4209

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Michael D. Adams

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

18575 Jamboree Road 9Th Fl

Irvine, CA 92612-1931

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Attorney at Attorney General

300 S. Spring St., Room 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/21/2021 By 17 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Per rule 8.212(b) - parties cannot stip after an GEX has been granted/given.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Per rule 8.212(b) - parties cannot stip after an GEX has been granted/given.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: AOB & RB stip ext rejected due to AOB ext having previously been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/04/2021 By 43 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: 1 RT (pgs. 1 - 18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 coming from Superior Court/Fee paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: J. Messer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/16/20 - proceeding by Rule 8.124 with RT's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed.; Notes: by appellants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: APLTS: Mercer & Carol MacPherson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2020-01143744; Trial Court Judge: Hunt, Derek

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Office of the Attorney General is a litigant