This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/18/2022 at 09:03:38 (UTC).

M. (M.) v. F. (H.)

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 M M filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against F H. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5642

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

M. M.

Appellant and Defendant

H. F.

Others

Shant Goorjian

Darren M. Richie

DRE, A.P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Brian C. Unitt

Attorney at Law Office of Brian C. Unitt

6185 Magnolia Avenue, Suite 40

Riverside, CA 92506-2524

Other Attorneys

Mark Schaeffer

Attorney at Benedon & Serlin, LLP

22708 Mariano Street

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Judith E. Posner

Attorney at Benedon & Serlin, LLP

22708 Mariano Street

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Kete P. Barnes

Attorney at Brown Neri Smith & Khan, LLP

11601 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2080

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Ethan J. Brown

Attorney at Brown Neri Smith & Khan, LLP

11601 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Antonio Castillo

Attorney at DRE, A.P.C.

222 N Canon Drive, Suite 201

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Other: Darren M. Richie Attorney: Ethan J. Brown Other: DRE, A.P.C. Attorney: Ethan J. Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: M. M. Attorney: Brian C. Unitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Other: Darren M. Richie Attorney: Ethan J. Brown Other: DRE, A.P.C. Attorney: Ethan J. Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E076431; Disposition: Dismissed by opinion; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: FLHE2001069

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRE APC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Judith E. Posner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Schaeffer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTILLO ANTONIO III