This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/02/2023 at 06:07:33 (UTC).

M-I, LLC v. The Superior Court of Kern County

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 M-I, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Kern County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3520

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Barmann, Bernard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

M-I, LLC

Respondent

The Superior Court of Kern County

Interested Party

Geo Drilling Fluids, Inc. and California Resources Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Heather Dawn Hearne

Interested Party Attorneys

Brian A. Dixon

Douglas A. Wickham

Morgan Eileen Podruski

Kieran D. Hartley

Ellen Connelly Cohen

Lonnie Clifford Blanchard

John Thomas Egley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT:* The "Petition for Writ of Mandamus," and the request for a stay, filed on November 10, 2021, are denied. Levy, A.P.J. * Before Levy, A.P.J., Pe a, J. and Meehan, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Sealed document filed *******; Notes: confidential filed under seal in lower court One Vol 255 pgs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: VOL 1 page 1-221

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: by atty heather D Hearne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate by counsel fro M-I LLC with Request for Stay of order, entered 9/28/21 granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Deposition of M-I, LLC and Production of Documents Pursuant to Deposition Subpoena.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons filed by:.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: writ info sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 by petitioner via True Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-15-101729; Trial Court Judge: Barmann, Bernard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less