This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/08/2023 at 07:09:37 (UTC).

Lydia Garcia v. Clinicas de Salud del Pueblo, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Lydia Garcia filed an Other lawsuit against Clinicas de Salud del Pueblo, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sykes, Sunshine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7311

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sykes, Sunshine

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Lydia Garcia

Appellant and Defendant

Clinicas de Salud del Pueblo, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Edwin Aiwazian

Attorney at Lawyers for Justice, PC

410 West Arden Avenue, Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Anthony Joshua Orshansky

Attorney at CounselOne, P.C.

9301 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 650

Beverly Hills, CA 90210-6199

Jennifer Lynn Connor

Attorney at CounselOne, P.C.

9301 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 650

Beverly Hills, CA 90210-6199

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Paul W., Jr. Cane

Attorney at Paul, Hastings, LLC

555 South Flower Street Twenty-Fifth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nancy L. Abell

Attorney at Paul, Hastings, LLP

515 South Flower Street Twenty-Fifth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Thomas Egley

Attorney at Call & Jensen, APC

610 Newport Center Drive, Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6498

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Grant request to continue oral argument.; Notes: Case is taken off calendar until further order of this court. The case will be placed on the oral argument calendar if appellant has not filed a request for dismissal on or before January 25, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Paul Cane will appear in person for oral argument

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request to continue oral arg - to court.; Notes: respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Jan 4, 2023 @ 8:30 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Issued tentative opinion or disputed issued memo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: ARB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: 70 day letter sent (rule 8.124).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: dtd Jun 28, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: (mailed to all counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: June 18, 2021; Clinicas de Salud del Pueblo, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1905175; Trial Court Judge: Sykes, Sunshine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clinicas De Salud Del Pueblo Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABELL NANCY L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANE PAUL WILLIAM JR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EGLEY, JOHN T