This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/27/2023 at 05:01:18 (UTC).

Luxury Lease Company v. Maldonado

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 Luxury Lease Company filed an Other lawsuit against Maldonado. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hammock, Randolph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4154

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hammock, Randolph

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Luxury Lease Company

Defendant and Appellant

Jorge Maldonado

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Marta Roza

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Gary Kurtz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 10, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid via credit card for Jorge Maldonado.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant's motion to vacate dismissal filed on December 2, 2022, and opposition thereto filed by respondent on December 5, 2022. Good cause appearing, appellant's motion to vacate dismissal is granted, and the appeal dated October 14, 2022, is reinstated on condition that appellant pays this court's filing fee within five (5) days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this relief order shall result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal without further notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: 1) Motion to Vacate Dismissal; and 2) [Proposed] Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: motion to reinstate rejected via True Filing - no bookmarks pursuant to CRC rule 8.74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed October 14, 2022, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Jorge Maldonado Attorney: Gary Kurtz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Jorge MaldonadoAttorney: Gary Kurtz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CIS rejected via True Filing - no judgment/order attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on October 14, 2022 by Jorge Maldonado.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV21812; Trial Court Judge: Hammock, Randolph

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less