This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/01/2020 at 17:46:00 (UTC).

LUXOR CABS v. APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 LUXOR CABS filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3536

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Luxor Cabs, Inc.

Haight Street Garage, Inc.

Luxor Executive Car Service, LLC

Defendants and Appellants

Applied Risk Services, Inc.

Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.

Applied Risk Services of New York, Inc.

California Indemnity Company

California Insurance Company

Not Yet Classified

Applied Underwriters, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Joseph C. Gjonola

Nicholas P. Roxborough

Defendant, Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Amanda L. Morgan

Shand S. Stephens

Jeanette Barzelay

John H. Podesta

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file folder, 1 accordion folder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Service copy of Answer to Petition electronically filed on February 25, 2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Luxor Cabs, Inc. Attorney: Joseph C. Gjonola Plaintiff and Respondent: Luxor Executive Car Service, LLC Attorney: Joseph C. Gjonola Plaintiff and Respondent: Haight Street Garage, Inc. Attorney: Joseph C. Gjonola

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: Luxor Cabs, Inc., Plaintiff and Respondent Joseph C. Gjonola, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file folder, one accordion folder.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Notice of New Authority. Applied Underwriters, Inc., Pub/Depublication Requestor Amanda L. Morgan, Retained counsel Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc., Defendant and Appellant Amanda L. Morgan, Retained counsel California Insurance Company, Defendant and Appellant Amanda L. Morgan, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. Attorney: Amanda L. Morgan Defendant and Appellant: California Insurance Company Attorney: Amanda L. Morgan Pub/Depublication Requestor: Applied Underwriters, Inc. Attorney: Amanda L. Morgan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. Attorney: Shand S. Stephens Defendant and Appellant: California Insurance Company Attorney: Shand S. Stephens Defendant and Appellant: Applied Risk Services, Inc. Attorney: Shand S. Stephens Defendant and Appellant: Applied Risk Services of New York, Inc. Attorney: Shand S. Stephens Defendant and Appellant: California Indemnity Company Attorney: Shand S. Stephens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and is available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: by Amanda L. Morgan counsel for appellants, premature de-publication request.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. Attorney: Shand S. Stephens Defendant and Appellant: California Insurance Company Attorney: Shand S. Stephens Defendant and Appellant: Applied Risk Services, Inc. Attorney: Shand S. Stephens Defendant and Appellant: Applied Risk Services of New York, Inc. Attorney: Shand S. Stephens Defendant and Appellant: California Indemnity Company Attorney: Shand S. Stephens ** Publication granted by the Court of Appeal on 1/3/2019. **

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: A147962; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CGC15548928

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less