This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/27/2021 at 18:15:54 (UTC).

Lucchesi v. Bank of America, N.A. et al.

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 Lucchesi filed an Other lawsuit against Bank of America, N A. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fell, Sheila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9769

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fell, Sheila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Darlyne Lucchesi

Seal Beach, CA 90740

Defendants and Respondents

Merscorp Holdings, Inc.

U.S. Bank National Association

Bank of America, N.A.

Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.

Nationstar Mortgage LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Adam F. Summerfield

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

355 S. Grand Ave, Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Justin Donald Balser

Attorney at Akerman Senterfitt LLP

601 West Fifth Street, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Tanya Louise Greene

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

355 S Grand Ave Ste 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3103

Abraham Colman

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 S. Grand Ave., Ste. 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Something is due; see note.; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate dismissal needs to be approved by Supreme Court. Waiting for a ruling.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Appellant's fee waiver.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate dismissal. Received only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of failure to comply with notice of default: Appellant failed to attach copy of the transcript reimbursement fund application filed under rule 8.130(c)(1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Appellant having failed to pay the statutory filing fee in compliance with rule 8.100(b)(1) of the California Rules of Court, after notice given pursuant to rule 8.100(c)(2), the appeal filed on December 24, 2020, is DISMISSED. Appellant is advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 30-day jurisdictional deadline.Order mailed to appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Appellant's dismissal order regarding filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: From respondent, Bank of America et al. Adding Attorney Tanya L. Green as attorney for respondent.NO conflict.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: By respondent Bank of America

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Exhibits in support of request for judicial notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Appellant regarding respondent's motion to dismiss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: respondent's rjn and supporting documents in support of motion to dismiss returned. No bookmarking on the request. The exhibits need bookmarks for each component including the index. Also each letter or number must have a description in the bookmarks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).; Notes: Filed by respondent Bank of America et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Respondent's motion for judicial notice was rejected. Documents need to be filed separately from motion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Mailed to appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: aplt's request for oral argument, submitted to court prematurely and no time estimate was indicated on the form.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplt Darlyne Lucchesi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01006479; Trial Court Judge: Fell, Sheila

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERSCORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant