This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/09/2021 at 09:39:26 (UTC).

LUCCHESI v. BANK OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 LUCCHESI filed an Other lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7135

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Darlyne Lucchesi

Seal Beach, CA 90740

Defendants and Respondents

Merscorp Holdings, Inc.

U.S. Bank National Association

Bank of America, N.A.

Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.

Nationstar Mortgage LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Adam F. Summerfield

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

355 S. Grand Ave, Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Justin Donald Balser

Attorney at Akerman Senterfitt LLP

601 West Fifth Street, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Tanya Louise Greene

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

355 S Grand Ave Ste 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3103

Abraham Colman

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 S. Grand Ave., Ste. 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Granted & Transferred to CA 4/3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Review granted on the court's own motion; transferred to CA 4/3; Notes: At the request of the Court of Appeal, review is ordered on this court's own motion. The cause is transferred to the Court of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District, Division Three, for further proceedings. Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Cullar, Kruger, Groban and Jenkins, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time for ordering review extended on the court's own motion; Notes: The time for ordering review on the court's own motion is hereby extended to and including May 17, 2021. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(c).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request to grant review on court's own motion; Notes: Information only: Court of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District, Division Three

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G059769; Disposition: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Central; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01006479

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERSCORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant