This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/18/2022 at 03:07:47 (UTC).

Los Angeles Waterkeeper v. State Water Resources Control Board

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Los Angeles Waterkeeper filed an Other lawsuit against State Water Resources Control Board. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chalfant, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2949

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Chalfant, James

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Los Angeles Waterkeeper

Appellant and Defendant

State Water Resources Control Board

Interested Parties

City of Burbank

City of Glendale

City of Los Angeles

City of Los Angeles Department of Public Works, Bureau of Sanitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelly Halford Clark

Attorney at Los Angeles Waterkeeper

120 Broadway Suite 105

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2385

Arthur Sidney Pugsley

Attorney at Los Angeles Waterkeeper

120 Broadway - #105

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Daniel Gordon Cooper

Attorney at Cooper & Lewand-Martin, Inc.

1004 O'Reilly Ave

San Francisco, CA 94129

Douglas P. Carstens

Attorney at Chatten-Brown & Carstens

2200 Pacific Coast Highway Suite 318

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Eric Meyer Katz

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Interested Party Attorneys

Amy Meredith Steinfeld

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

1021 Anacapa Street Floor 2

Santa Barbara, CA 93101-2102

Stephanie Osler Hastings

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck LLP

1021 Anacapa Street Floor 2

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Amelia Ann Albano

Attorney at Burbank City Attorney

275 E. Olive Avenue

Burbank, CA 91502

Christopher Chwang

Attorney at City of Burbank

275 East Olive Avenue

Burbank, CA 91502

Dorine Martirosian

Attorney at Office Of The City Attorney

613 E Broadway Suite 220

Glendale, CA 91206

Michael Joseph Garcia

Attorney at Glendale City Attorney's Office

613 E Broadway Suite 220

Glendale, CA 91206

Melissa Anne Thorme

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Adena M. Hopenstand

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 North Main Street, 7Th Floor City Hall East, Room 700

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the joint application to stay appeal filed August 2, 2021. The application is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for stay filed.; Notes: Joint application to stay appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: State Water Resources Control Board Attorney: Eric Meyer Katz (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 16, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: State Water Resources Control BoardAttorney: Eric Meyer Katz; Notes: (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: April 8, 2021: State Water Resources Control Board - (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BS171009; Trial Court Judge: Chalfant, James

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Los Angeles Department of Public Works, Bureau of Sanitation is a litigant

Latest cases where State Water Resource Control is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant