This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/16/2021 at 13:18:06 (UTC).

Los Angeles Waterkeeper v. State Water Resources Control Board

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Los Angeles Waterkeeper filed an Other lawsuit against State Water Resources Control Board. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chalfant, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9148

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Chalfant, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Appellants

Los Angeles Waterkeeper

State Water Resources Control Board

Defendant and Appellant

State Water Resources Control Board

Interested Parties

City of Burbank

City of Los Angeles

City of Glendale

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Gordon Cooper

Attorney at Sycamore Law, Inc.

1004 O'Reilly Ave

San Francisco, CA 94129

Arthur Sidney Pugsley

Attorney at Los Angeles Waterkeeper

120 Broadway - #105

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Douglas P. Carstens

Attorney at Chatten-Brown & Carstens

2200 Pacific Coast Highway Suite 318

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Amy Minteer

Attorney at Chatten-Brown, Carstens & Minteer LLP

2200 Pacific Coast Highway Suite 318

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Michelle Nicole Black

Attorney at Chatten-Brown Carstens & Minteer LLP

2200 Pacific Coast Highway Suite 318

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Kelly Halford Clark

Attorney at Los Angeles Waterkeeper

120 Broadway Suite 105

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2385

Eric Meyer Katz

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Eric Meyer Katz

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Interested Party Attorneys

Stephanie Osler Hastings

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck LLP

1021 Anacapa St. Fl 2

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Amy Meredith Steinfeld

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

1021 Anacapa St Fl 2

Santa Barbara, CA 93101-2102

Amelia Ann Albano

Attorney at Burbank City Attorney

275 E. Olive Avenue P.O. Box 6459

Burbank, CA 91502

Elisabeth Louise Esposito

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

1021 Anacapa Street 2Nd Floor

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Christopher Chwang

Attorney at City of Burbank

275 East Olive Avenue

Burbank, CA 91502

Adena M. Hopenstand

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 North Main Street City Hall East, Room 916

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Melissa Anne Thorme

Attorney at Downey, Brand, Seymour & Rohwer

555 Capitol Mall Tenth Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814-4686

Dorine Martirosian

Attorney at Office Of The City Attorney

613 E Broadway Suite 220

Glendale, CA 91206

Michael Joseph Garcia

Attorney at Glendale City Attorney's Office

613 E Broadway Suite 220

Glendale, CA 91206

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Documents refiled.; Notes: [B309151]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: B309151 (lead), B309153, B309155.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Joint Application to Consolidate Appeals...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Los Angeles Waterkeeper Attorney: Amy Minteer Cross-appeal filed December 8, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Los Angeles WaterkeeperAttorney: Amy Minteer; Notes: Cross-appeal filed December 8, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 1192 for $775.00[Cross-Appeal Dec 8, 2020 (X): Los Angeles Waterkeeper]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: [Cross-Appeal Dec 8, 2020 (X)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cross-Appeal filed Dec 8, 2020 by Los Angeles Waterkeeper (X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed Dec 15, 2020: Appendix w/RT (Administrative Proceeding) (Appeal Nov 25, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: State Water Resources Control Board Attorney: Eric Meyer Katz (Appeal Nov 25, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: (Appeal Nov 25, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: State Water Resources Control BoardAttorney: Eric Meyer Katz; Notes: (Appeal Nov 25, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Nov. 25, 2020: State Water Resources Control Board

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BS171012; Trial Court Judge: Chalfant, James

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Water Resource Control is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BURBANK PARAMEDIC SERVICES is a litigant