This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/12/2022 at 23:06:01 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT v. S.C. (CARVAJAL)

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT filed an Other lawsuit against C CARVAJAL. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9690

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Los Angeles Unified School District

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Varina Carvajal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Calvin R. House

Attorney at Gutierrez Preciado & House LLP

3020 East Colorado Boulevard

Pasadena, CA 91107

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Ben Jared Meiselas

Attorney at Geragos & Geragos APC

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Dev Deep Das

Attorney at Geragos & Geragos APC

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3411

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied without prejudice to any claims that either party might raise on appeal from the final judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Varina Carvajal Attorney: Ben Jared Meiselas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Los Angeles Unified School District Attorney: Calvin R. House

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including October 4, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition requested; Notes: Calvin R. House Gutierrez Preciado & House LLP 3020 East Colorado Boulevard Pasadena, CA 91107 Re: S269690- Los Angeles Unified School District v. S.C. (Carvajal) Dear Counsel: The court has directed that I request an answer to the petition for review filed in the above referenced matter. The petition was served on your office on July 6, 2021. The answer must be served upon petitioner and filed in this court on or before 3:00 p.m. on Monday, August 30, 2021. The answer should address all issues and arguments raised in the petition for review. Petitioner must file and serve a reply to the answer on or before 3:00 p.m. on Thursday, September 2, 2021. The court does not contemplate granting any requests for extension of time. Very truly yours, JORGE E. NAVARRETE Clerk and Executive Officer of the Supreme Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Varina Carvajal Attorney: Ben Jared Meiselas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Timely petition for review with deficiencies: no electronic bookmark, no court of appeal decision. Counsel requested to resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311392; Disposition: Order dismissing petition; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCP04170

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEISELAS BEN J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAS DEV DEEP