This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/06/2023 at 00:14:04 (UTC).

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services v. K.C.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against K C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Soto, Philip. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5766

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Soto, Philip

 

Party Details

Respondent and Petitioner

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services

Appellant

K. C.

Not Yet Classified

A. M.

Others

C. M.

Hon. Philip L. Soto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

Janette F. Cochran

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Anna Rak

Other Attorney

David C. Alaynick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/06/2023

HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to appellant's request for appointment of counsel, and under the authority of Penal Code Section 1240, subdivision (a) (1), the following attorney is appointed counsel for appellant on this appeal: Janette Cochran Appellant's opening brief shall be filed within thirty days from the date of this order. Appellant is directed to keep the court informed of his/her mailing address at all times. If you move, you MUST notify the clerk of this court immediately; otherwise you may not receive important notices concerning your appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: TWO: Clerks (547 Pages), ONE: reporter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 12-1-22 by K.C. (mother); from 11-23-22 order as to minor A.M. 20CCJP00027 20CCJP00027G

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP00027G; Trial Court Judge: Soto, Philip

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP00027; Trial Court Judge: Soto, Philip

[+] Read More [-] Read Less