Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 06/04/2021 at 00:14:14 (UTC).

Lorraine James v. HSRE Pacifica Hillsborough TRS, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Lorraine James filed an Other lawsuit against HSRE Pacifica Hillsborough TRS, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Arreola, Rafael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6824

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 2

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Arreola, Rafael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Lorraine James

Defendants and Appellants

HSRE Pacifica

HSRE Pacifica Hillsborough TRS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Spencer Eliot Peck

Attorney at Peck Law Group

6454 Van Nuys Blvd Ste 150

Van Nuys, CA 91401-1407

Steven C. Peck

Attorney at Peck Law Group

6454 Van Nuys Boulevard, Suite 150

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Adam Joshua Peck

Attorney at Peck Law Group

6454 Van Nuys Boulevard, Suite 150

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Lann G. McIntyre

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: by appellant, dtd Apr 9, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: from appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Apr 1, 2021; HSRE Pacifica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVDS2020390; Trial Court Judge: Arreola, Rafael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK ADAM J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK STEVEN C. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK SPENCER ELIOT