This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/14/2021 at 13:02:52 (UTC).

Lopez v. Irvine Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Lopez filed an Other lawsuit against Irvine Company, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Servino, Deborah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9354

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Servino, Deborah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Arthur Lopez

Newport Beach, CA 92658

Defendants and Respondents

Irvine Company, LLC

The Newport Bordeaux Apartments

The Irvine Company Apartment Communities, Inc.

Newport Bluffs, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Steven E. Bolanos Mejia

Attorney at Ruzicka Wallace & Coughlin LLP

16520 Bake Parkway Ste 280

Irvine, CA 92618-7113

Frank J. Coughlin

Attorney at Ruzicka, Wallace & Coughlin, LLP

16520 Bake Parkway Ste 280

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: 30 days EOT Granted per order 11/18/202030 days EOT Granted per order 01/06/2131 days EOT Granted per order 02/02/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 04/07/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 04/07/2021 By 30 Day(s) Paper Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for an extension of time to file appellant's opening brief is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Appellant is granted to March 08, 2021 to file appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 04/06/2021 By 60 Day(s) Paper copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for an extension of time to file appellant's opening brief is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Appellant is granted February 5, 2021 to file appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested EOT until 04/06/21Arthur Lopez, Plaintiff and Appellant Pro Per Paper copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for an extension of time to file appellant's opening brief is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Appellant is granted to January 06, 2021 to file appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 02/03/2021 By 58 Day(s) Paper copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Mailed notice to appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 1-CT (1-134 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of inability to provide RT. There is no record of any on 07/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 9/04/20. Appellant proceeding by rule 8.122 w/ CT & RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: (Paper copy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Pursuant to the filing of a Request to Waive Court Fees and Costs, and with good cause appearing therefor, IT IS ORDERED that appellate court fees and costs for the above-entitled action are waived pursuant to rule 8.26. This fee waiver applies only to the appellate fees and costs identified in California Rules of Court, rule 8.26(e) [appellate court filing fee; court fee for telephonic oral argument]. Any request for a waiver of superior court costs and fees must be addressed to the superior court.Mailed copy to appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's CCIS was returned; missing judgment or minute order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: By appellant Arthur Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Mailed to appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplt: Arthur Lopez (pro per)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01000086; Trial Court Judge: Servino, Deborah

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWPORT BORDEAUX APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Newport Bluffs LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant