This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/06/2023 at 14:01:34 (UTC).

Lofton v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Lofton filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Karlan, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3150

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Karlan, Craig

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kevin Lofton

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Craig D. Karlan

Interested Parties

Accounting Principals, Inc.

William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC

Chris Jefferis

Kimberly Starratt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorneys

Joshua Adam Rodine

Patrick J. Cain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed September 14, 2022. The petition is denied. The record indicates the statement of disqualification was properly stricken because it was "untimely filed" and "on its face it discloses no legal grounds for disqualification." (Code Civ. Proc., 170.4, subd. (b).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Petitioner (per operation of law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less