This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/11/2022 at 05:18:47 (UTC).

Loewen v. City of San Jose

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Loewen filed an Other lawsuit against City of San Jose. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0036

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Evet Loewen

Defendants and Respondents

City of San Jose

David Sykes

Board of Administration of the Federated City Employees' Retirement System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert James Bezemek

Attorney at Law Office of Robert J. Bezemek

1322 Webster St Ste 401

Oakland, CA 94612

Tanya T. Smith

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. BEZEMEK

1322 Webster St., Suite 401

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Raymond Francis Lynch

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Matthew Joseph Peck

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market St Fl 26

San Francisco, CA 94105

Nora Frimann

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 E. Santa Clara St., 16Th Fl.

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Osc issue on court reporter re: unfiled record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Considered with case #; Notes: H049387 and H050036

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Appellants' motion to consolidate appeal nos. H049387 and H050036 is denied. On the court's own motion, these appeals shall be considered together for purposes of oral argument and disposition.Filed in lead case H049387

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's certificate of compliance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Filed on May 12, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Amended Civil Case Information statement correcting the lower court case number.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Your submitted filing has been rejected. Duplicate upload.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Filed by Robert J. Bezemek with order of 3/22/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Respondent's, filed 5/16/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Respondent's default notice, filed 5/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed 5/5/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Evet Loewen, Filed 5/5/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 17CV312610; Trial Court Judge: Kuhnle, Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SAN JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Joseph Peck

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynch, Raymond Francis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frimann, Nora V.