This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/09/2022 at 20:00:18 (UTC).

Loeffler v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Loeffler filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Oberholzer, Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1386

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Oberholzer, Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jennifer Loeffler

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. Richard Oberholzer, Dept C25 700 Civic Center Drive

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

Lifetime Fitness, Inc.

Carol Gourlay

Dee Steelsmith

Amy Nestor

LTF CLub Operations Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Steven Lewis Rader

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven L. Rader

57 Molly Loop

Ladera Ranch, CA 92694

Interested Party Attorney

Esther P. Holm

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

650 Towne Center Dr Ste 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: all documents are scanned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate is DENIED. O'LEARY, P. J. * Before O'Leary, P. J., Goethals, J., and Sanchez, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: Paid by RPI for opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Preliminary Opposition to petition for writ of mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits in support of preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits in support of petition for writ of mandate. Pages 1-70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for writ of mandate filed by petitioner Jennifer Loeffler

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifetime Fitness Inc. d/b/a Life Time Fitness is a litigant

Latest cases where LTF Club Operations Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLM ESTHER P