This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/23/2023 at 01:15:19 (UTC).

lntellisoft, LTD. v. Acer America Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 lntellisoft, LTD filed an Other lawsuit against Acer America Corporation. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9311

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

lntellisoft, LTD.

Respondent and Defendant

Acer America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Holly Noelle Boyer

Attorney at Esner, Chang & Boyer

234 E Colorado Blvd Ste 975

Pasadena, CA 91101-2262

Andrew Joseph Spielberger

Attorney at Balaban & Spielberger LLP

11999 San Vicente Blvd Ste 345

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Daniel Keith Balaban

Attorney at Balaban and Spielberger LLP

11999 San Vicente Blvd Ste 345

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Shea Sierra Murphy

Attorney at Esner, Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Blvd., Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Eric Samuel Boorstin

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 W Olive Ave Fl 8

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Jordan David Grotzinger

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park E Ste 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-7700

Shane Heather McKenzie

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 W Olive Ave Fl 8

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Harold Henry Davis

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

4 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111-4195

Lisa Jean Perrochet

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy

3601 West Olive Avenue 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505

Matthew Gordon Ball

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

4 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 1200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jason Nathaniel Haycock

Attorney at K&L Gates

4 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: *NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Requested for 02/06/2023 By 17 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 02/06/2023 By 17 Day(s) 4th * NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS *

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 01/20/2023 By 30 Day(s) 3rd *NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Requested for 01/20/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 12/21/2022 By 30 Day(s) 2nd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 11/21/2022 By 32 Day(s) 1st

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record in box.; Notes: (3) electronic boxes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's appendix filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Acer America Corporation Attorney: Eric Samuel Boorstin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended 8/20/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant, judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's certificate of compliance filed 8/16/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Appellant's default notice filed 8/12/21: CRC 8.100 The $100 fee has not been deposited 8.100(b)(2). CRC 8.130 Deposit or Fee Waiver for reporter's transcript not timely deposited/filed. ($560 reporter's transcripts + $50 admin fee = $61 0)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 8/9/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Horvitz & Levy LLP added as co-counsel for respondent Acer America Corporation and Acer Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Intellisoft, LTD., Filed 7/28/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACER AMERICA CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION C/O FRONTIER LOGISTICS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Haycock, Jason Nathaniel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Samuel Boorstin