This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/29/2023 at 03:18:48 (UTC).

LNSU #1, LLC et al. v. Alta Del Mar Coastal Collection Community Association

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 LNSU 1, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Alta Del Mar Coastal Collection Community Association. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sturgeon, Eddie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1204

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sturgeon, Eddie

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

LNSU #1, LLC

LNSU #2, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

Alta Del Mar Coastal Collection Community Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

James Friedhofer

Mark Beale Simpkins

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Craig Joel Mariam

John Barry Fraher

Jonathan Andrew Schaub

Scott W. McCaskill

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: CASE FULLY BRIEFED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: LNSU #1, LLC Attorney: Mark Beale Simpkins Plaintiff and Appellant: LNSU #2, LLC Attorney: Mark Beale Simpkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: LNSU #1, LLCAttorney: Mark Beale Simpkins Plaintiff and Appellant: LNSU #2, LLCAttorney: Mark Beale Simpkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: A/15 (Remote)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: R/15 (In-person)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: May 8, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's appendix filed.; Notes: 1 Volume (183)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Alta Del Mar Coastal Collection Community Association Attorney: Scott W. McCaskill

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Alta Del Mar Coastal Collection Community AssociationAttorney: Scott W. McCaskill

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: LNSU #1, LLC Attorney: Mark Beale Simpkins Plaintiff and Appellant: LNSU #2, LLC Attorney: Mark Beale Simpkins 4 Volumes (1276)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: E. Simone #14261 - 8/12/22 G. Mazon #9356 - 8/19/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: 11/2/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 10/4/22 by LNSU #1, LNSU #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2018-00032291-CU-MC-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Sturgeon, Eddie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less