This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/28/2023 at 20:01:23 (UTC).

Little et al. v. Singh et al.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 Little filed an Other lawsuit against Singh. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3989

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Clark, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Laurence Mitchell Little

Susan Little

Respondents and Defendants

Davinder Singh

U.S. Freight Carrier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Ralph B. Wegis

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

John Steven Lowenthal

Dana Alden Fox

Joseph V. Bui

Robert A. Olson

 

Court Documents

F083989

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The order taxing costs claimed under section 998 is affirmed. Defendants shall recover costs on appeal.; Poochigian, Detjen, Smith; 7 pages.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Poochigian, Charles S.; Participants: Smith, M. Bruce (Concur) Detjen, Jennifer R.S. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The order taxing costs claimed under section 998 is affirmed. Defendants shall recover costs on appeal.; Poochigian, Detjen, Smith; 7 pages.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: May 10, 2023, at 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Rsp Csl Olson - PA/15 Mins Conflict Dates: May 1-5, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Aplt Csl Wegis - PA/15 Mins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Attorney address changed.; Notes: Atty Bui obo respondents, Law Firm Address Change: GREINES, MARTIN, STEIN & RICHLAND LLP 6420 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1100 Los Angeles, California 90048

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Laurence Mitchell Little Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Susan Little Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: 3/23/22; Atty Wegis obo applts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: To all counsel and court; The Court has determined that the above-entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2 (Mediation in Civil Appeals), the suspension of the operation of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and 8.216 requiring designation of the record on appeal, payment of the estimated costs of preparation of the record on appeal, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule is terminated as of this date. You are directed to comply immediately with the applicable California Rules of Court as if the notice of appeal was filed as of the date of this letter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Bui

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Atty Lowenthal obo Respondents associates atty Olson, Bui

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Wegis obo applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Weigs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By Atty Weigs obo applt's for $775 via check #31965

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The Court requires that within 10 calendar days, appellant(s) and respondent(s) complete and submit the Mediation Screening Questionnaire. (Ct. App., Fifth Dist., Local Rules, rule 2.) The Questionnaire must be accompanied by a Proof of Service on opposing counsel AND a copy of the verdict, order or judgment appealed from, including tentative rulings. The information you provide on this Questionnaire will be used for the sole purpose of screening this appeal for inclusion in the Court's Mediation Program and will not become part of the public record on appeal. Your failure to provide the Court with this information may result in the imposition of monetary sanctions and/or the dismissal of your appeal. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2, the provisions of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124 and 8.216, requiring designation of the record, payment of estimated costs for preparation of the record, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule are suspended pending the Court's decision to select or not select this case for mediation. The Civil Case Information Statement remains due within 15 days after the superior court clerk sends the notification of the filing of the notice of appeal (California rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).) The Mediation Screening Questionnaire form is available in fillable PDF or MS Word format on the Court's website at http://www.courts.ca.gov/2997.htm under the section entitled "Forms & Rules." Questionnaires are to be submitted via TrueFiling at www.truefiling.com. If you need further assistance, please contact the Civil team at (559) 442-2754.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Wegis obo Applts Laurence Mitchell Little and Susan Little appeal from the 12/17/21 ruling re the motion to tax.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-17-101322; Trial Court Judge: Clark, Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less