This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/24/2023 at 09:09:39 (UTC).

Little et al. v. Singh et al.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Little filed an Other lawsuit against Singh. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3583

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Clark, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Laurence Mitchell Little

Susan Little

Defendants and Appellants

David Singh

U.S. Freight Carrier LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Nicholas Charles Rowley

Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich

Ralph B. Wegis

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Dana Alden Fox

Robert A. Olson

Joseph V. Bui

John Steven Lowenthal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Atty Ehrlich informing the court he would like to appear in person for oral argumented on 5/10/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: May 10, 2023, at 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Aplt Csl Olson - PA/20 Mins Conflict Dates: May 1-5, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Rsp Csl Ehrlich - VC/15 Mins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Thumb Drive placed in expando; saved to G Drive: Departments\Clerks\Exhibits\UNASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Applt's Notice of Lodging, thumb drive that contains electronic copies of (1) Appellant's reply brief, (2) respondent's brief, (3) the appendix, and (4) the surveillance videos Exhibit Nos. 270-286) that appellants previously lodged with the trial court as part of their efforts to introduce those videos as impeachment evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Applt's Notice of Lodging, thumb drive that contains electronic copies of (1) Appellant's reply brief, (2) respondent's brief, (3) the appendix, and (4) the surveillance videos Exhibit Nos. 270-286) that appellants previously lodged with the trial court as part of their efforts to introduce those videos as impeachment evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: atty Bui obo Applt; Notice of Intent to Lodge thumb drive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: RTX with Appendix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Olson obo Applt's Singh et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All Counsel and Superior Court Re: The Court has determined that the above entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2 (Mediation in Civil Appeals), the suspension of the operation of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and 8.216 requiring designation of the record on appeal, payment of the estimated costs of preparation of the record on appeal, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule is terminated as of this date. You are directed to comply immediately with the applicable California Rules of Court as if the notice of appeal was filed as of the date of this letter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Kawai obo Respondent's Little et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Olson obo Applt's Singh et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Check 191747 from N Calif Legal Support Service, Inc. obo Appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: John Lowenthal associates Robert Olson and Joseph Bui obo appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All Counsel and Superior Court RE: Mediation Screening Questionnaires due w/n 10 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: John Lowenthal counsel for appellant Singh et al from judgment on special verdict issued 9/24/21 in favor of respondents Laurence and Susan Little

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-17-101322; Trial Court Judge: Clark, Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less