This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/29/2022 at 22:28:18 (UTC).

LIEBOVICH v. TOBIN

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 LIEBOVICH filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against TOBIN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1214

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Matthew Liebovich

Joshua Liebovich

Andrew Liebovich

Esther Liebovich

Respondents and Defendants

Diane Tobin

Lori Robin

Marc Chopp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Mitchell Keiter

Attorney at Keiter Appellate Law

The Beverly Hills Law Building 424 South Beverly Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Robert Neil Sacks

Attorney at Sacks, Glazier, Franklin & Lodise LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3475

Douglas E. Lawson

Attorney at Sacks Glazier

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christopher D. Carico

Attorney at Carico Macdonald Kil & Benz LLP

841 Apollo Street, Suite 450

El Segundo, CA 90245-4722

John Andrew Scheerer

Attorney at Sacks, Glazier, Franklin & Lodise LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3475

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Matthew Liebovich Attorney: Mitchell Keiter Plaintiff and Appellant: Joshua Liebovich Attorney: Mitchell Keiter Plaintiff and Appellant: Andrew Liebovich Attorney: Mitchell Keiter Plaintiff and Appellant: Esther Liebovich Attorney: Mitchell Keiter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Diane Tobin Attorney: Robert Neil Sacks Defendant and Respondent: Lori Robin Attorney: Robert Neil Sacks Defendant and Respondent: Marc Chopp Attorney: Robert Neil Sacks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Matthew Liebovich Attorney: Mitchell Keiter Plaintiff and Appellant: Joshua Liebovich Attorney: Mitchell Keiter Plaintiff and Appellant: Andrew Liebovich Attorney: Mitchell Keiter Plaintiff and Appellant: Esther Liebovich Attorney: Mitchell Keiter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B306184; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BP138119

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHEERER JOHN ANDREW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWSON DOUGLAS E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARICO CHRISTOPHER DANIEL