This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/03/2023 at 07:09:12 (UTC).

Libman et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Libman filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosales, Olivia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2074

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rosales, Olivia

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Michael J. Libman

Law Offices of Michael J. Libman

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Olivia Rosales

Interested Parties

Hon. Gerald Rosenberg

California Force Patrol, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michael Jacob Libman

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorneys

Steven M. Polito

Nicole D. Allen

William Thomas Pascoe

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Notes: THE COURT:* On June 28, 2021, the superior court vacated its April 13, 2021 order, as directed by this court's June 24, 2021 alternative writ, and set a hearing to consider the parties' views on the referee's recommendations. In light of the court's compliance, it is hereby ordered that the petition filed on May 5, 2021 is dismissed as moot. The alternative writ is discharged, and the September 15, 2021 hearing date is vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Minute order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Real Party in Interest's notice of withdrawal of request for relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Alternative writ or OSC issued.; Notes: TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES: Good cause appearing therefore, you are hereby required either to: (a) after notice to the parties and an opportunity to be heard pursuant to Brown, Winfield & Canzoneri, Inc. v. Superior Court (2010) 47 Cal.4th 1233, 1250, fn. 10, vacate the April 13, 2021 order adopting the referee's April 1, 2021 report, and consider the parties' objections and reply in making an informed decision whether to adopt the referee's recommendations (see Rockwell Internat. Corp. v. Superior Court (1994) 26 Cal.App.4th 1255, 1269-1270); or (b) in the alternative, SHOW CAUSE before this court in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California, on September 15, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., why a peremptory writ of mandate ordering you to do so should not issue on the ground that petitioners have demonstrated entitlement to relief. Any written return to this writ shall be served and filed by July 22, 2021. Petitioners may file and serve a reply by August 12, 2021. In the event that respondent superior court complies with alternative (a) of this writ at any time prior to September 15, 2021, petitioners shall immediately so advise this court by letter and file a certified copy of the order constituting such compliance.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: RPI's motion for relief (volume 1 of 1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Points and authorities and argument in support of request for relief from default, filed by RPI, California Force Patrol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Petitioner's response to William T. Pascoe's declaration of June 17, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: William T. Pascoe, filed by California Force Patrol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 14.4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 14.3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 14.2.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 14.1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 13.7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits; Volume 13 Continued (only one volume)Other volumes included here are: Vol.13.8, Vol.13.10, Vol.13.11, Vol.13.12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits; Volumes 1-13 (2 sets of Vol.13)Other volumes included are: Vol. 13.3, Vol. 13.4, Vol 13.5 and Vol. 13.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE-STAY REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less