This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/04/2023 at 09:01:43 (UTC).

LG CHEM v. S.C. (LAWHON)

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 LG CHEM filed an Other lawsuit against C LAWHON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6160

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LG Chem, Ltd.

Respondent

Superior Court of San Diego County

Interested Party

Ryan Lawhon

Not Yet Classified

Gupta Wessler PLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Wendy Sabina Dowse

Jeffry A. Miller

Interested Party Attorneys

Kevin F. Quinn

Benjamin Israel Siminou

Doug Keller

Brett Justin Schreiber

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Jennifer D. Bennett

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Depublication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Depublication request denied (case closed); Notes: The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion is denied. The court declines to review this matter on its own motion. The matter is now final. Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- LG Chem, Ltd., Petitioner Wendy Sabina Dowse, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time for ordering review extended on the court's own motion; Notes: The time for ordering review on the court's own motion is hereby extended to and including October 25, 2022. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(c).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (depublication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (initial case event); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Gupta Wessler PLLC Attorney: Jennifer D. Bennett

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D079718; Disposition: Petition granted by opinion; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2019-00047411-CU-PO-CTL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less