This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/04/2023 at 09:01:43 (UTC).

LG CHEM v. S.C. (LAWHON)

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 LG CHEM filed an Other lawsuit against C LAWHON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6160

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LG Chem, Ltd.

Respondent

Superior Court of San Diego County

Interested Party

Ryan Lawhon

Not Yet Classified

Gupta Wessler PLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Wendy Sabina Dowse

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

74830 Us Highway 111, Suite 200

Indian Wells, CA 92210-7101

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Interested Party Attorneys

Kevin F. Quinn

Attorney at Thorsnes Bartolotta McGuire LLP

2550 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92103

Benjamin Israel Siminou

Attorney at Singleton Schreiber LLP

450 A Street, 5Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Doug Keller

Attorney at Singleton Schreiber McKenzie & Scott

450 A Street, 5Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Brett Justin Schreiber

Attorney at Thorsnes Bartolotta McGuire

2550 5Th Avenue, 11Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92103

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Jennifer D. Bennett

Attorney at GUPTA WESSLER PLLC

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Depublication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Depublication request denied (case closed); Notes: The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion is denied. The court declines to review this matter on its own motion. The matter is now final. Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- LG Chem, Ltd., Petitioner Wendy Sabina Dowse, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time for ordering review extended on the court's own motion; Notes: The time for ordering review on the court's own motion is hereby extended to and including October 25, 2022. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(c).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (depublication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (initial case event); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Gupta Wessler PLLC Attorney: Jennifer D. Bennett

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D079718; Disposition: Petition granted by opinion; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2019-00047411-CU-PO-CTL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less