Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/04/2021 at 04:29:07 (UTC).

Lewellyn v. Callion

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Lewellyn filed an Other lawsuit against Callion. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Klein, Clifford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7885

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 4

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Klein, Clifford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Petitioner

Larry Lewellyn

Burbank, CA 91501

Appellant

Twyla Callion

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Not Yet Classified

Reeves, Betty Lou - Conservatorship

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Larry D. Lewellyn

Attorney at Law Offices of Larry D. Lewellyn

2305 Torrance Blvd. Suite 1024

Torrance, CA 90501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant's motion to vacate dismissal and reinstate. Appellants' motion vacate dismissal and reinstate is granted. The dismissal order filed March 19, 2021 is hereby vacated and the appeal filed September 8, 2020 is reinstated. Appellant is granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by failure to perform acts required by the rules of court for procuring the record on appeal for the appeal filed September 8, 2020. Appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order perform any act for which the Superior Court has placed appellant in default. All acts in compliance with this relief order are to be performed in the Los Angeles Superior Court at 111 North Hill Street, Room 111, Los Angeles, California. If appellant fails to cure the default in the time granted, the Clerk of the Superior Court shall immediately notify the Court of Appeal, and the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate dismissal and reinstate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed Feb 3, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: From Larry Lewellyn - court's Dec 16, 2020 order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Twyla Callion Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Twyla CallionPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Good cause appearing, the order of dismissal filed November 16, 2020, is vacated and the appeal filed September 8, 2020, is reinstated. Appellant is granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by appellant's failure to comply as required by the rules of court. Appellant is required to file a Civil Case Information Statement with this Court, within 15 days of the date of this order. The Civil Case Information Statement must include a copy of the judgment or order being appealed, with proof of service on all parties. California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g). If appellant fails to file the Case Information in a timely manner, the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: The following document returned to Appellant Twyla Callion without filing. (1) Motion to vacate dismissal of appeal returned for lack of proof of service on opposing parties as required by CRC 8.25(a) (2) a Check# 1006 for $25.00 (no filing fee is required for filing a motion to vacate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: 11/16/2020 order - Lewellyn, Larry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed Nov 6, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(g), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed September 8, 2020, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Designation filed 1-.29.20 - clerk's and reporter's transcripts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Sep 8, 2020 by Twyla Callion

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWELLYN LARRY DARRYL