This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/13/2021 at 01:51:11 (UTC).

Levy v. Horn et al.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Levy filed an Other lawsuit against Horn. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mandel, Elaine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1081

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 5

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mandel, Elaine

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Shaoul Levy

Appellants and Defendants

Jennifer Horn

Jason Horn

Janis F. Horn

Hali Horn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul D. Murphy

Attorney at Murphy Rosen, LLP

100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Mark Joseph Nagle

Attorney at Murphy Rosen LLP

100 Wilshire Bvld., Suite 1300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Daniel Nathan Csillag

Attorney at Murphy Rosen, LLP

100 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1300

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1142

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Daniel S. Miller

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Ave Of The Stars Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David W. Schecter

Attorney at Miller Barondess

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4632

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: [ APPELLANTS' APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 11/02/2021 By 60 Day(s) [ THE COURT: The court vacates appellant's default. ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 11/02/2021 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: [ VACATED PER THE ORDER OF THE COURT ON AUGUST 31, 2021. ]Janis Horn et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Janis F. Horn Attorney: David W. Schecter Defendant and Appellant: Jason Horn Attorney: David W. Schecter Defendant and Appellant: Hali Horn Attorney: David W. Schecter Defendant and Appellant: Jennifer Horn Attorney: David W. Schecter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 11/02/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Janis F. HornAttorney: Daniel S. Miller Attorney: David W. Schecter Defendant and Appellant: Jason Horn Defendant and Appellant: Hali Horn Defendant and Appellant: Jennifer Horn; Notes: [ APPELLANTS' APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Janis F. HornAttorney: David W. Schecter Defendant and Appellant: Jason HornAttorney: David W. Schecter Defendant and Appellant: Hali HornAttorney: David W. Schecter Defendant and Appellant: Jennifer HornAttorney: David W. Schecter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card; Janis F. Horn, Defendant and Appellant Daniel S. Miller, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: appellants' notice filed 2/18/2021 in trial court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 2/8/2021 by Janis F. Horn et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20SMCP00069; Trial Court Judge: Mandel, Elaine

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAGLE MARK J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CSILLAG DANIEL NATHAN