This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/10/2023 at 00:17:57 (UTC).

LESLIE JARMUS FAMILY TRUST DATED 06/04/09

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 LESLIE JARMUS FAMILY TRUST DATED 06/04/09 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Penny, Brenda and Suzuki, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0263

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

Penny, Brenda

Suzuki, Paul

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Steven Jarmus

Respondents and Defendants

Mark Jarmus

Cheryl Morris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Alan Toshio Yoshitake

Bruce S. Ross

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Joseph S. Klapach

Lawrence Michael Lebowsky

David Gerald Greco

Phillip John Szachowicz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: [NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 06/09/2023 By 60 Day(s) Application for third extension of time to file Appellant's appendix and opening brief is granted to June 9, 2023. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Edmon, P. J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 06/09/2023 By 60 Day(s) Application for third extension of time to file Appellant's appendix and opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of death of Cross-appellant and Respondent Mark Jarmus.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 04/10/2023 By 17 Day(s) Appellant's appendix and opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Briefing sequence order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the parties' stipulation to extend time to file appellant's and cross-appellants' opening briefs. Good cause appearing, it is ordered: 1.Steven Jarmus shall file his appellant's opening brief on or before March 24,2023; 2.Mark Jarmus and Cheryl Morris shall file consolidated respondent'sbriefs/cross-appellant's opening briefs 74 days after the filing of the appellant's opening brief; 3.Steven Jarmus shall file a consolidated appellant's reply brief/cross-respondent's brief 30 days after the filing of the consolidated respondent's briefs/cross-appellant's opening briefs; and 4.Mark Jarmus and Cheryl Morris shall file optional cross-appellant's replybriefs 20 days after the filing of the a consolidated appellant's reply brief/cross-respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: [Stipulation to extend time to file appellant's and cross-appellants' opening brief.] (Forwarded to the court for a ruling as only opening brief by Appellant Steven Jarmus is scheduled.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: SEVEN (R-7): reporters transcript + ONE: duplicate of original reporters.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Joseph S. Klapach substitutes in to represent Mark Jarmus (respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: It appears that the Notice of Cross-Appeal filed by Steven Jarmus on April 18, 2022 was entered in the above Court of Appeal case number B320541 on May 24, 2022 through inadvertence and clerical error. IT IS HEREBY NOTIFIED that all documents for the April 18, 2022 cross-appeal previously entered in case number B320541 are re-assigned under appellate case number B320263. All future filings for the above-referenced cross-appeal shall be made under the case number B320263.(re-filed from B320541)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Mark JarmusAttorney: Lawrence Michael Lebowsky Defendant and Respondent: Cheryl MorrisAttorney: Lawrence Michael Lebowsky; Notes: (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Mark Jarmus Attorney: Phillip John Szachowicz Defendant and Respondent: Cheryl Morris Attorney: Phillip John Szachowicz Cross Appeal U2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Mark JarmusAttorney: Phillip John Szachowicz Defendant and Respondent: Cheryl MorrisAttorney: Phillip John Szachowicz; Notes: Cross Appeal U2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 652026 for $775.00 [for Appeal filed on March 29, 2022 by Steven Jarmus] (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cross Appeal filed on April 12, 2022 by Mark Jarmus and Cheryl Morris (as to SCLA case BP173009) (U2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on April 1, 2022 by Mark Jarmus and Cheryl Morris (as beneficiaries, as to SCLA case BP173009) (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on March 29, 2022 by Steven Jarmus (as to SCLA case BP173009) (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BP173010; Trial Court Judge: Suzuki, Paul; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BP173009; Trial Court Judge: Penny, Brenda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less