This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/03/2023 at 18:05:24 (UTC).

LESLIE JARMUS FAMILY TRUST DATED 06/04/09

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 LESLIE JARMUS FAMILY TRUST DATED 06/04/09 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzuki, Paul and Penny, Brenda. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0263

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

Suzuki, Paul

Penny, Brenda

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Steven Jarmus

Respondents and Defendants

Mark Jarmus

Cheryl Morris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Alan Toshio Yoshitake

Bruce S. Ross

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Joseph S. Klapach

Lawrence Michael Lebowsky

Phillip John Szachowicz

David Gerald Greco

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOLUMES 1-12 Attorneys for Appellant and Cross-Respondent, STEVEN JARMUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOLUME 12 of 12, PAGES 2913-3032

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOLUME 11 of 12, PAGES 2810-2912

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOLUME 10 of 12, PAGES 2512-2809

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOLUME 9 of 12, PAGES 2249-2511

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOLUME 8 of 12, PAGES 1953-2248

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOLUME 7 of 12, PAGES 1700-1952

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOLUME 6 of 12, PAGES 1407-1699

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOLUME 5 of 12, PAGES 1111-1406

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Mark JarmusAttorney: Lawrence Michael Lebowsky Defendant and Respondent: Cheryl MorrisAttorney: Lawrence Michael Lebowsky; Notes: (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Mark Jarmus Attorney: Phillip John Szachowicz Defendant and Respondent: Cheryl Morris Attorney: Phillip John Szachowicz Cross Appeal U2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Mark JarmusAttorney: Phillip John Szachowicz Defendant and Respondent: Cheryl MorrisAttorney: Phillip John Szachowicz; Notes: Cross Appeal U2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 652026 for $775.00 [for Appeal filed on March 29, 2022 by Steven Jarmus] (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cross Appeal filed on April 12, 2022 by Mark Jarmus and Cheryl Morris (as to SCLA case BP173009) (U2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on April 1, 2022 by Mark Jarmus and Cheryl Morris (as beneficiaries, as to SCLA case BP173009) (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on March 29, 2022 by Steven Jarmus (as to SCLA case BP173009) (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BP173010; Trial Court Judge: Suzuki, Paul; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BP173009; Trial Court Judge: Penny, Brenda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less