This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/06/2022 at 04:38:42 (UTC).

LEGAL AID SOCIETY OF SAN MATEO COUNTY v. DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE (CITY OF REDWOOD CITY)

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 LEGAL AID SOCIETY OF SAN MATEO COUNTY filed an Other lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE CITY OF REDWOOD CITY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7548

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants, Plaintiffs, Respondents and Interested Parties

Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County

City of Redwood

Respondents and Defendants

Department of Finance

Keely M. Bosler

Juan Raigoza

Respondents, Defendants and Interested Parties

Department of Finance

Keely M. Bosler

Juan Raigoza

City of Redwood City

Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County

Other, Respondent and Defendant

Juan Raigoza

Respondents and Interested Parties

City of Redwood City

Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Interested Party, Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Veronica Ramirez

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1017 Middlefield Road

Redwood City, CA 94063

Iris P. Yang

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 1700

Sacramento, CA 95814

James M. Wagstaffe

Attorney at Wagstaffe VonLoewenfeldt Busch & Radwick LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 725

San Francisco, CA 94111-1528

Michael John Von Loewenfeldt

Attorney at Wagstaffe Vonloewenfeldt Busch & Radwick

100 Pine Street, Suite 725

San Francisco, CA 9411

Valerie Louise Feldman

Attorney at Public Interest Law Project

449 15Th Street, Suite 301

Oakland, CA 94612-2038

Richard Rothschild

Attorney at Western Center on Law And Poverty

3701 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Respondent, Defendant and Other Attorneys

S. Clinton Woods

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7020

Kenny H. Louie

Attorney at Department of Finance

915 L Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Daniel Todd McCloskey

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

400 County Center, 6Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94063

Respondent, Defendant, Other and Plaintiff Attorneys

S. Clinton Woods

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7020

Kenny H. Louie

Attorney at Department of Finance

915 L Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Daniel Todd McCloskey

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

400 County Center, 6Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94063

Veronica Ramirez

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1017 Middlefield Road

Redwood City, CA 94063

Iris P. Yang

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 1700

Sacramento, CA 95814

James M. Wagstaffe

Attorney at Wagstaffe VonLoewenfeldt Busch & Radwick LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 725

San Francisco, CA 94111-1528

Michael John Von Loewenfeldt

Attorney at Wagstaffe Vonloewenfeldt Busch & Radwick

100 Pine Street, Suite 725

San Francisco, CA 9411

Valerie Louise Feldman

Attorney at Public Interest Law Project

449 15Th Street, Suite 301

Oakland, CA 94612-2038

Richard Rothschild

Attorney at Western Center on Law And Poverty

3701 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note: Mail returned (unable to forward); Notes: Order sent to Kenny H. Louie has been returned, attempted not known, unable to forward.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Depublication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Depublication request denied (case closed); Notes: The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion in the above-entitled appeal is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: one doghouse ( volume 1 of 3 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Plaintiff and Appellant Valerie Louise Feldman, Retained counsel -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- City of Redwood, Plaintiff and Appellant Michael John Von Loewenfeldt, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (depublication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (initial case event); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Keely M. Bosler Attorney: S. Clinton Woods

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C076431 C076428 (lead); Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 34201380001447CUWMGDS; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 34201380001449CUWMGDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Finance NYC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Iris P. Yang