This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/26/2023 at 09:01:20 (UTC).

Legacy Partners Residential, Inc. v. Shah

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 Legacy Partners Residential, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Shah. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2092

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Legacy Partners Residential, Inc.

Appellant and Defendant

Runal Shah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Kareem Munir Khalidy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed July 18, 2022, is dismissed. In addition the Court notes that appellant has also failed to file a Case Information Statement. (2DCA/APP-004)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant ( 7/18/2022 - Runal Shah ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: filing fee not received ($775)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: notice of appeal filed 7/18/2022 - Runal Shah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC570312

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less