This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/16/2023 at 04:05:04 (UTC).

Ledesma et al. v. Mariner Health Care, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 Ledesma filed an Other lawsuit against Mariner Health Care, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grillo, Evelio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6783

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Grillo, Evelio

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Maricela Ledesma

Celina Ledesma

Alberto Ledemsa

David Ledesma

Alejandro Ledesma

Esther Ledesma

Araceli Ledesma

Esmeralda Ledesma

Henry Rice

Marcus Moore

Nancy Sanchez

Joe Sanchez

Eddie Sanchez

Feleai Ah-Hing

James Cearley, Jr.

Sandra Cearley

Frances McCalope

Robert McCalope

John Seelig

Robert Seelig

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart B. Esner

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Boulevard - Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Other Attorneys

Darryl Alan Ross

5440 Trabuco Road

Irvine, CA 92620

Bryan Robert Reid

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

650 E Hospitality Lane, Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Tracy Diana Forbath

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-8198

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.; Notes: no remittitur will issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel - 15 days to file case information statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 1066, Esner Chang & Boyer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/09/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiffs Maricela Ledesma et al. appealing judgment from 08/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19025110; Trial Court Judge: Grillo, Evelio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less