This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/26/2023 at 02:07:19 (UTC).

Leckner v. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 Leckner filed an Other lawsuit against General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mangione, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0899

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mangione, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Erik Leckner

Respondents and Defendants

General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.

Apex Systems, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Patrice Suberlak

Wendy Amoreena Sugg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF. Due on 07/14/2023 By 59 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-3 (751 pages); RT-7 (1,001 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 8/18/22 Apex Systems, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: 8/8/22 notice of proceedings not reported re 1/14/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: 8/8/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 8/8/22 Clerks and Reporters

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 7/29/22 Erik Leckner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2020-00003058-CU-JR-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Mangione, James

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less