This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/17/2023 at 02:02:09 (UTC).

LAW OFFICES OF GARY KURTZ v. MARKOWITZ

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 LAW OFFICES OF GARY KURTZ filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against MARKOWITZ. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8397

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Law Offices of Gary Kurtz

Appellant and Defendant

Philip Markowitz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Scott Mayes

Jonathan Grant Gabriel

Gary Kurtz

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Craig R. Smith

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Philip Markowitz Attorney: Craig R. Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B315162; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: LC103719

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less