This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/12/2022 at 00:22:32 (UTC).

Lara v. Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 Lara filed an Other lawsuit against Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stern, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4077

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Stern, Michael

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Raul Lara

Appellants and Defendants

Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc.

Damco Distribution Services Inc.

Maersk Inc.

Damco Distribution Services, Inc.

Maersk, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Irina Aleksanyan

3435 Wilshire Blvd Ste 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Jason James Buccat

Attorney at Law Offices of Ramin R. Younessi

3435 Wilshire Blvd. Suite2200

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2008

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Clayton J Hix

300 S Grand Ave 37Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

E. Sean McLoughlin

Attorney at Hill, Farrer & Burril LLP

One California Plaza, 37Th Floor 300 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Michael Alexander Wertheim

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1840 Century Park E Ste 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2121

Mark David Kemple

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed as abandoned; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT:* Appellant Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. filed a notice of settlement on December 7, 2021. Appellants Damco Distribution Services, Inc. and Maersk, Inc. filed a notice of settlement on December 13, 2021. Appellants have not filed a request for dismissal of appeal or notice of abandonment within the time required pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.244(a)(3). It is hereby ordered that the appeals filed July 20, 2021 and July 26, 2021 are dismissed as abandoned. Each side shall bear its own costs on appeal. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(a)(4).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.; Notes: THE COURT:* Appellant Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. filed a notice of settlement on December 7, 2021. Appellants Damco Distribution Services, Inc. and Maersk, Inc. filed a notice of settlement on December 13, 2021. Appellants have not filed a request for dismissal of appeal or notice of abandonment within the time required pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.244(a)(3). It is hereby ordered that the appeals filed July 20, 2021 and July 26, 2021 are dismissed as abandoned. Each side shall bear its own costs on appeal. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(a)(4).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.; Notes: Filed by appellants Damco Distribution Services, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.; Notes: Filed by appellant Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. (July 20, 2021: Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc.; Notes: (July 20, 2021: Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (7/26/2021 by Damco Distribution Services Inc. and Maersk Inc. - (R) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (7/20/2021 by Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 5, 2021 - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 30, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #395892 for $775(Appeal 7/20/2021: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check# 395696 for $775.00 (LA Depositions, Inc) *appeal filed 7/26/2021 by Damco Distribution Services Inc. and Maersk Inc.* ("R")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 7/26/2021 by Damco Distribution Services Inc. and Maersk Inc. ("R")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 7/20/2021 by Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV29087; Trial Court Judge: Stern, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC. DBA HUDD TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MAERSK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HIX CLAYTON J