This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/19/2021 at 14:31:32 (UTC).

LAND v. CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 LAND filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4989

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Justin Land

Cotati, CA 94931

Defendants, Respondents and Others

Echosphere LLC

California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board

Employment Development Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Maria J. Garfinkle

Attorney at Garfinkle Law Office

1205 Via Gabarda

Lafayette, CA 94549

Gary S. Garfinkle

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1205 Via Gabarda

Lafayette, CA 94549

Defendant, Respondent and Other Attorneys

Jose Macias

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

50 West San Fernando - 15Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Dane Christian Barca

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Justin Land Attorney: Gary S. Garfinkle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board Attorney: Dane Christian Barca Defendant and Respondent: Employment Development Department Attorney: Dane Christian Barca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Justin Land Attorney: Gary S. Garfinkle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Justin Land: The court has considered your request to waive court fees. Your request has been denied. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.26(f).) The filing fee for a petition for review is $710.00. You have ten (10) days from the date of this notice to pay your fees and costs. Failure to submit the filing fee within ten (10) days of the date of this letter may result in your filing being stricken by the court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Justin Land Attorney: Gary S. Garfinkle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: A153959; Disposition: Reversed & remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: RG16825540

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Echosphere LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maria J Garfinkle