This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/02/2022 at 17:00:16 (UTC).

Kwan v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Kwan filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Feng, Samuel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5190

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Feng, Samuel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Renee Kwan

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

Steven A. Ellenberg

Ellenberg & Hull, LLP

Andrew P. Holland

Thoits Law, PC

Hopkins & Carley, LC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Paul J. Steiner

Attorney at Law Offices of Paul J. Steiner

275 Battery Street, #1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gary S. Garfinkle

1205 Via Gabarda

Lafayette, CA 94549

Interested Party Attorney

Alison P. Buchanan

Attorney at Hoge, Fenton, Jones & Appel, Inc

55 South Market Street - Suite 900

San Jose, CA 95113-2324

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate is denied without prejudice. The petition lacks a record sufficient to enable informed appellate review. (Sherwood v. Superior Court (1979) 24 Cal.3d 183, 186-187; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1)(B)-(D).) While not intended to comprise an exhaustive list of documents that should have been provided, the petition does not include petitioner's initial fee waiver application filed on February 10, 2022 (see Exh. B to Petn.), any order issued by respondent superior court setting petitioner's March 21, 2022 amended fee waiver application for hearing and possibly disclosing the reason for that hearing (see Gov. Code, 68634, subd. (e)(4)-(5)), and any reporter's transcript of the April 13 and 20, 2022 hearings or a statement in counsel's declaration (Exh. 7) clarifying that such a transcript is "unavailable" (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(3)). In the event the petition is refiled, that petition shall include the foregoing materials or include a statement in counsel's declaration that they are unavailable, and the petition shall also include any other documents filed in the superior court regarding all of plaintiff's fee waiver applications. * Before Jackson, P.J., and Needham, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: For petitioner Kwan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Corrected exhibits in support of petition, from Gary Garfinkle, attorney for petitioner Kwan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Various exhibits indexed in alphabetical and chronological order.Note: Confidential financial documents enclosed with exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or Other Appropriate ReliefNote: This writ is a public record, however confidential financial matters are enclosed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC21594460; Trial Court Judge: Feng, Samuel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ellenberg & Hull, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Hopkins & Carley is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco is a litigant