This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/28/2021 at 02:09:20 (UTC).

Kuchta v. Grubert

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Kuchta filed an Other lawsuit against Grubert. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McSorley, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5604

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McSorley, Robert

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Terry Kuchta

Appellate Division

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Defendant and Appellant

Margaret Grubert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley T. Weeks

Attorney at Charlton Weeks LLP

1031 West Avenue M-14, Suite A

Palmdale, CA 93551

Rikka J. Fountain

Attorney at Charlton Weeks LLP

1031 West Avenue M14 Ste A

Palmdale, CA 93551

Hon. Robert A. McSorley

Antelope Valley Courthouse 42011 4Th Street West

Lancaster, CA 93534

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Sahar Durali

Attorney at Neighborhood Legal Services of Los Angeles County

13327 Van Nuys Blvd.

Pacoima, CA 91331

David Pallack

Attorney at Neighborhood Legal Service of L.A. County

13327 Van Nuys Blvd.

Pacoima, CA 91331

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: File(s) returned to county clerk.; Notes: Two volumes in one Redweld folder (BV034229, 19AVUD01821)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition to transfer the case to the Court of Appeal filed on October 12, 2021, has been read and considered. The petition is denied for failure to demonstrate that transfer is necessary to secure uniformity of opinion or to settle an important question of law. (See California Rules of Court, rule 8.1002.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition summarily denied by order.; Notes: The petition to transfer the case to the Court of Appeal filed on October 12, 2021, has been read and considered. The petition is denied for failure to demonstrate that transfer is necessary to secure uniformity of opinion or to settle an important question of law. (See California Rules of Court, rule 8.1002.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: File(s) received from county clerk.; Notes: Two volumes in one Redweld folder (BV034229, 19AVUD01821)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition to transfer from appellate division filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURALI, SAHAR